Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Demetrio Mansilla Reoyo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1910Born
22 Sep 193423.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 195847.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain
15 Nov 195847.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
4 Jan 195948.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
7 Jul 196453.6AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
7 Jan 198877.1RetiredBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
7 Dec 199888.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Demetrio Mansilla Reoyo
Bishop Demetrio Mansilla Reoyo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Ausines

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018