Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Homero Leite Meira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Irecê, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1931BornBrumado
8 Dec 195524.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 197846.9AppointedBishop of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil
27 Dec 197847.0Ordained BishopBishop of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil
24 Sep 198048.8AppointedBishop of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil
13 Jun 198351.5ResignedBishop of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil
8 May 201482.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Homero Leite Meira:
Bishop Homero Leite Meira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Irecê

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 10 May 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015