Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Juan de Taverner y Rubí

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornBarcelona
5 Oct 169953.7AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
10 Dec 169953.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
16 Dec 172074.9AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
24 Mar 172175.2DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Juan de Taverner y Rubí:
Archbishop Miguel Juan de Taverner y Rubí (born 1646, died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 209, and Page 369
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,097
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 242, Number 1,497
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 10 Jul 2015