Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Cernuda Rico y Piñeros

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1658BornLa Montaña
22 May 171354.7AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
13 Aug 171355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
Apr 171556.6DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Cernuda Rico y Piñeros:
Bishop Bartolomé Cernuda Rico y Piñeros (born ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,634

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013