Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sancho Antonio Belunza Corcuera

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1652³BornHaro
21 Aug 171360.8SelectedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
11 Dec 171361.1ConfirmedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
11 Mar 171461.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
5 Oct 171663.9AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
15 Oct 173178.9DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sancho Antonio Belunza Corcuera:
Bishop Sancho Antonio Belunza Corcuera (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,635
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 152, and Page 354
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 29, Number 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015