Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Augustyn Michal Stefan Cardinal Radziejowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1645Born
1668²22.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 167933.8SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
23 Sep 168034.8ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
26 Jan 168135.1Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
2 Sep 168640.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 168842.4AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
14 Nov 168943.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
11 Oct 170559.8DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustyn Michal Stefan Radziejowski (VIAF: 442220)
Augustyn Michal Stefan Cardinal Radziejowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoznan

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
  • a cardinal for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,856
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast