Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Konstanty Samuel Lipski

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625BornGnesnen
17 Mar 168156.2AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
28 Sep 168156.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
19 May 169873.4DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Konstanty Samuel Lipski:
Archbishop Konstanty Samuel Lipski (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 242
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013