Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Stanisław Zbąski

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1639¹BornSmardzenice
11 Oct 167738.7AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
22 May 167839.3Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
3 Sep 168849.6SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
6 Dec 168849.9ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
16 Oct 168950.7InstalledBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
21 May 169758.3DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Stanisław Zbąski:
Bishop Jan Stanisław Zbąski (born 1639, died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 323, and Page 405
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1678, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015