Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Kos

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
1648Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
19 Nov 1657AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
14 Jul 1658Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
11 Feb 1661DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Adam Kos
Bishop Adam Kos (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 13.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 169
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,658, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast