Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Sweeny

Deceased

Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1821BornClones, Ireland
1 Sep 184423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
29 Nov 185938.5AppointedBishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
15 Apr 186038.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
25 Mar 190179.9DiedBishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Sweeny:
Bishop John Sweeny (born , died ) Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013