Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Colin Francis MacKinnon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada

Titular Archbishop of Amida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1811Born
1 Jan 183725.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 185140.1AppointedBishop of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
26 Feb 185240.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
17 Jul 187765.9ResignedBishop of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
7 Sep 187766.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
26 Sep 187968.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Colin Francis MacKinnon (VIAF: 48757924)
Archbishop Colin Francis MacKinnon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arichat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilliam's Point
Ordained PriestUrban College de Propaganda Fide, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Cathedral, Halifax, Diocese of Halifax, Nova Scotia
Death PlaceAntigonish, Diocese of Arichat, Nova Scotia
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Ninian, Cathedral, Antigonish, Diocese of Arichat, Nova Scotia

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 95, and Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 7
  • c1/loc: CB, 10 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Apr 2019

Quantcast