Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Louis Connolly, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1813¹BornCork, Ireland
1837¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 May 185239.3AppointedBishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
15 Aug 185239.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
8 Apr 185946.3AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
27 Jul 187663.6DiedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Louis Connolly:
Archbishop Thomas Louis Connolly O.F.M. Cap. (died ) Archbishop of Halifax

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 298, and Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013