Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico Carfagnini, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gallipoli, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Cius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1823Born
19 Sep 184623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
13 May 187047.1AppointedBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada
22 May 187047.1Ordained BishopBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada
27 Feb 188056.9AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
24 Mar 189875.0RetiredBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
24 Mar 189875.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cius
12 Feb 190480.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Carfagnini
Archbishop Enrico Carfagnini O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gallipoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScanno, Diocese of Valva e Sulmona
Ordained BishopCollege of the Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 204, and Page 281
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 465
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Feb 2017