Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislav Lenic

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana

Titular Bishop of Vazi-Sarra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1911BornCerklje ob Krki
4 Jul 193725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
29 Nov 196756.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
29 Nov 196756.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazi-Sarra
14 Jan 196856.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazi-Sarra
5 Nov 198876.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
4 Jan 199179.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Stanislav Lenic:
Bishop Stanislav Lenic (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015