Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Joseph von Riccabona (Reichenfels)

Deceased

Bishop of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1761³BornCavalese
30 Nov 178322.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Regensburg, Germany
20 Dec 178322.3Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
25 Dec 182665.4SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
9 Apr 182765.6ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
25 Apr 182765.7Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
25 May 183977.8DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Joseph von Riccabona (Reichenfels) (VIAF: 10653809)
Bishop Karl Joseph von Riccabona (Reichenfels) (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jul 2016