Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalbert von Pechmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Canopus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1777³Born
25 Mar 180123.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Passau, Germany
27 Mar 180123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
24 May 182446.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
24 May 182446.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
25 Jul 182446.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
9 Mar 186082.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adalbert von Pechmann (VIAF: 90984344)
Bishop Adalbert von Pechmann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegen

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast