Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver von Schwäbl

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1778³BornReisbach
30 May 180122.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Passau, Germany
30 Aug 180122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
17 Mar 183354.3SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
15 Apr 183354.4ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
26 May 183354.5Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
12 Jul 184162.7DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver von Schwäbl:
Bishop Franz Xaver von Schwäbl (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013