Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Martin Manl

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1766³BornMainz
17 May 178822.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
28 Mar 178923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
22 Jul 182660.5SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
9 Apr 182761.2ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
25 Apr 182761.3Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
25 Mar 183569.2SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
6 Apr 183569.2ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
1 Jul 183569.5InstalledBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
15 Oct 183569.7DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Martin Manl:
Bishop Johann Martin Manl (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 191, and Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013