Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Montfort Stima (Sitima)

Bishop of Mangochi, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1957 Born
3 Aug 198628.6Ordained PriestPriest of Blantyre, Malawi
25 Jan 201052.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Blantyre, Malawi
25 Jan 201052.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Puppi
24 Apr 201052.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Puppi
6 Dec 201355.9AppointedBishop of Mangochi, Malawi
22 Feb 201456.1InstalledBishop of Mangochi, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Montfort Stima (Sitima)
Bishop Montfort Stima (Sitima) (born ) Bishop of Mangochi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mangochi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,631
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2013
  • i: CB, 29 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast