Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Achille Cardinal Locatelli

Deceased

Chamberlain Emeritus of the College of Cardinals

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1856Born
20 Dec 187923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
22 Nov 190650.6AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Argentina
6 Dec 190650.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
27 Dec 190650.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
7 Jul 191660.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
30 Jul 191660.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
17 Mar 191761.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Luxembourg
13 Jul 191862.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
11 Dec 192266.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 192367.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
15 Jul 192973.3AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
30 Jun 193074.2ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
16 Oct 193377.5AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
1 Apr 193579.0ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
5 Apr 193579.0DiedChamberlain Emeritus of the College of Cardinals

MicroData Summary for Achille Locatelli
Achille Cardinal Locatelli (born , died ) Chamberlain Emeritus of College of Cardinals

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeregno, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
  • a cardinal for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Dec 1922
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 83
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 41, and Page 66, and Page 170
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 187, and Page 216, and Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast