Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damiano Giulio Guzzetti, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Moroto, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1959 Born
25 May 198525.8ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
27 Mar 198929.6Perpetual VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
23 Sep 198930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
20 Feb 201454.5AppointedBishop of Moroto, Uganda
24 May 201454.8Ordained BishopBishop of Moroto, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Damiano Giulio Guzzetti
Bishop Damiano Giulio Guzzetti M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Moroto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurate, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Moroto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast