Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Hamilton in Bermuda

Dioecesis Hamiltonensis in Bermuda



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Robert Joseph Kurtz, C. R., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 12 June 1967
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nassau
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bermuda
  • Region: Antilles (West Indies)
  • Square Kilometers: 54 (20 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the Bermuda Islands.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholicbermuda.org/
  • Mailing Address: St. Theresa's Cathedral, P.O. Box HM 1191, Hamilton HM EX; 2 Astwood Road, Paget DV 04, Bermuda Islands
  • Telephone: (441)232-4414
  • Fax: 232-4447

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bermuda Islands
19 February 1953ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Bermuda Islands (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bermuda Islands
28 January 1956ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bermuda Islands Vicariate Apostolic of Bermuda Islands
Diocese of Hamilton in Bermuda
12 June 1967ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bermuda Islands Diocese of Hamilton in Bermuda

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bermuda Islands
19664,60048,0009.6%1785757186ap1967
Diocese of Hamilton in Bermuda
19708,01051,06615.7%2242,0022177ap1971
19768,50052,50016.2%2799447127ap1977
19809,00062,10014.5%1891,0001897ap1981
19909,00060,00015.0%2681,125857ap1991
19998,71258,46014.9%1671,244646ap2000
20008,71258,50014.9%661,452636ap2001
20019,30062,47214.9%661,550636ap2002
20029,30062,47214.9%661,550636ap2003
20039,27566,54513.9%1561,545536ap2004
20049,27566,54513.9%551,855536ap2005
20069,27566,54513.9%1561,545526ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 24 Sep 2013