Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hubertus Soudant, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palembang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1922BornHeer, Netherlands
11 Sep 194927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
3 Jan 196138.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Palembang, Indonesia
3 Jan 196138.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tadamata
29 Jun 196139.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tadamata
5 Apr 196341.0SucceededBishop of Palembang, Indonesia
20 May 199775.1RetiredBishop of Palembang, Indonesia
29 Dec 200381.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Palembang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hubertus Soudant:
Bishop Joseph Hubertus Soudant S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palembang

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013