Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Gratian Grimm, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1901BornJügesheim (now Rodgau-Jügesheim), Germany
192422.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Aug 193029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Apr 194947.7AppointedBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China
25 Jul 194948.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China
17 Nov 195958.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sibolga, Indonesia
12 Mar 197169.6ResignedApostolic Administrator of Sibolga, Indonesia
24 Nov 197271.3DiedBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China

MicroData Summary for Peter Gratian Grimm:
Bishop Peter Gratian Grimm O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow]

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013