Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carlos de Souza Campos

Bishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1968 BornItaúna
30 May 199325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Nov 201244.8AppointedAdministrator of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Feb 201446.1AppointedBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 May 201446.4Ordained BishopBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Carlos de Souza Campos:
Bishop José Carlos de Souza Campos (born ) Bishop of Divinópolis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Divinópolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2014
  • ob/c1+: CB, 26 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Feb 2014