Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tarcísio Nascentes dos Santos

Bishop of Duque de Caxias, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1954 BornNiterói
8 Dec 197824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
11 Feb 200955.0AppointedBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 Apr 200955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Aug 201258.4AppointedBishop of Duque de Caxias, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tarcísio Nascentes dos Santos:
Bishop Tarcísio Nascentes dos Santos (born ) Bishop of Duque de Caxias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Duque de Caxias.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,152
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Feb 2014