Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Gaughren, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange

Titular Bishop of Tentyris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1843BornStillorgan, Ireland
23 Apr 186724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Jan 190258.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange, South Africa
23 Jan 190258.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tentyris
16 Mar 190258.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tentyris
1 Jun 191471.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Matthew Gaughren:
Bishop Matthew Gaughren O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 540
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013