Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teemu Jyrki Juhani Sippo, S.C.I.

Bishop of Helsinki, Finland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1947 Born
11 Oct 197023.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
28 May 197730.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
16 Jun 200962.0AppointedBishop of Helsinki, Finland
5 Sep 200962.2Ordained BishopBishop of Helsinki, Finland

MicroData Summary for Teemu Jyrki Juhani Sippo
Bishop Teemu Jyrki Juhani Sippo S.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Helsinki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLahti
Ordained BishopLutheran, Cathedral, Turku

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Helsinki.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,268
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast