Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Francisco Simón Piorno

Bishop of Chimbote, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1945 Born
22 Apr 197327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
18 May 199145.4AppointedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
5 Jul 199145.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
18 Mar 199549.2AppointedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
4 Feb 200458.1AppointedBishop of Chimbote, Peru
2 May 200458.4InstalledBishop of Chimbote, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ángel Francisco Simón Piorno
Bishop Ángel Francisco Simón Piorno (born ) Bishop of Chimbote

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorbellino di Sayago, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chimbote.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast