Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovikus Simanullang, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sibolga, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1955Born
2 Aug 198126.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Jul 198328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Mar 200751.8AppointedBishop of Sibolga, Indonesia
20 May 200752.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sibolga, Indonesia
20 Sep 201863.4DiedBishop of Sibolga, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Ludovikus Simanullang
Bishop Ludovikus Simanullang O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Sibolga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSogar
Ordained BishopSibolga, Diocese of Sibolga
Death PlaceMedan, North Sumatera

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2007
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,423

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 20 Sep 2018

Quantcast