Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Americo Cardinal Ferreira dos Santos Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Porto

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1829BornPorto
26 Sep 185223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
31 May 187142.4SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
26 Jun 187142.4ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
10 Sep 187142.7Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
12 May 187950.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 Feb 188051.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
21 Jan 189970.0DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Americo Ferreira dos Santos Silva:
Cardinal Americo Ferreira dos Santos Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
  • a cardinal for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 465, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 May 1879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013