Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Shi Jingxian, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1921Born
28 Dec 193918.9EnteredMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
8 Jul 194322.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
29 Jun 194827.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
8 May 199170.2Ordained BishopBishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh], China
13 May 199978.2InstalledBishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh], China
16 Sep 200988.6DiedBishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh], China

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Shi Jingxian
Bishop Nicholas Shi Jingxian O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShe-Liou-Lou, Henan
Ordained PriestSüchow
Ordained BishopXi’an, Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]
Death PlaceShanqiu, Diocese of Shangqiu [Kweiteh]

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c12: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 May 2020

Quantcast