Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Shangqiu [Kweiteh]

Dioecesis Coeitevensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 8,000 (3,090 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Shangqiu, Henan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kweiteh [Shangqiu]
19 June 1928ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Kweiteh [Shangqiu] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kweiteh [Shangqiu]
18 May 1937ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kweiteh [Shangqiu] Vicariate Apostolic of Kweiteh [Shangqiu]
Diocese of Shangqiu [Kweiteh]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kweiteh [Shangqiu] Diocese of Shangqiu [Kweiteh]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Shangqiu [Kweiteh]
19509,9732,000,000.5%141471217ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 25 Aug 2012