Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Li Duan

Deceased

Bishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1927Born
11 Apr 195123.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 198759.7SelectedBishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China
5 Apr 198759.8Ordained BishopBishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China
25 May 200678.9DiedBishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China

MicroData Summary for Anthony Li Duan
Bishop Anthony Li Duan (born , died ) Bishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQiu Village, Lintong District, Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]
Ordained BishopXi’an, Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 16 Sep 2020

Quantcast