Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Serrano Pastor, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Darién

Titular Bishop of Hypselis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1902BornCorella, Spain
29 May 192624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
7 Apr 195653.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Darién, Panama
7 Apr 195653.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypselis
22 Aug 195654.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hypselis
22 Jul 198179.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Darién, Panama
14 Jul 199795.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Darién, Panama

MicroData Summary for Jesús Serrano Pastor:
Bishop Jesús Serrano Pastor C.M.F. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Darién

  • a priest for 71.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013