Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustinus Tumaole Bane, O.M.I.

Bishop of Leribe, Lesotho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1947 Born
6 Jan 197123.3ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Jan 197729.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 Jun 200961.8AppointedBishop of Leribe, Lesotho
19 Sep 200962.0Ordained BishopBishop of Leribe, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Augustinus Tumaole Bane
Bishop Augustinus Tumaole Bane O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Leribe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMotsistseng, Mokhotlong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Leribe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018