Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Schuster

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1842Born
9 Jul 186522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Seckau, Austria
20 Oct 189350.9AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
31 Dec 189351.1Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
18 Mar 192784.4DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Leopold Schuster (VIAF: 47137225)
Bishop Leopold Schuster (born , died ) Bishop of Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Anna am Aigen
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 508
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1893, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017