Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ägidius Johann Zsifkovics

Bishop of Eisenstadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1963 BornGüssing
29 Jun 198724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Eisenstadt, Austria
9 Jul 201047.2AppointedBishop of Eisenstadt, Austria
25 Sep 201047.4Ordained BishopBishop of Eisenstadt, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ägidius Johann Zsifkovics:
Bishop Ägidius Johann Zsifkovics (born ) Bishop of Eisenstadt

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Eisenstadt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,800

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013