Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Schmitzberger, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornNeukirchen
164919.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
165121.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Dec 167343.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien, Austria
18 Dec 167343.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
28 Jan 167444.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
28 Aug 168353.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Schmitzberger:
Bishop Johannes Schmitzberger O.S.B. (born 1630, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015