Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilderich von Walderdorff

Deceased

Bishop of Wien, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1617Born
165941.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
28 Jun 166952.4SelectedBishop of Wien, Austria
19 Aug 166952.5ConfirmedBishop of Wien, Austria
29 Sep 166952.7Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
4 Sep 168063.6DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

MicroData Summary for Wilderich von Walderdorff
Bishop Wilderich von Walderdorff (born , died ) Bishop of Wien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimburg

  • a priest for 21.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 414
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018