Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hyacinthus Dimitri, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1619BornCattaro
13 Jan 168161.8AppointedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
9 Mar 168162.0Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
5 Jul 168667.3DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthus Dimitri:
Bishop Hyacinthus Dimitri O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015