Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emerich (Johann Anton) Sinelli, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Wien, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1622Born
164320.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
164926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Nov 168058.3SelectedBishop of Wien, Austria
3 Mar 168158.6ConfirmedBishop of Wien, Austria
11 May 168158.8Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
28 Feb 1685³62.6DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emerich (Johann Anton) Sinelli
Bishop Emerich (Johann Anton) Sinelli O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Wien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomorn

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 414
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast