Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jodok Brendt Hopner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Passau

Titular Bishop of Lampsacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1606BornNeustadt
163124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
165851.1IncardinatedPriest of Passau, Germany
19 May 167063.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
19 May 167063.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
3 Aug 167063.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
168275.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
23 Feb 168679.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jodok Brendt Hopner:
Bishop Jodok Brendt Hopner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Passau

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015