Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Stavěl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Zaraï


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1869Born
19 Sep 189425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
29 Apr 192758.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
29 Apr 192758.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaraï
5 Jun 192758.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaraï
6 Nov 193869.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Jan Stavěl (VIAF: 84464581)
Bishop Jan Stavěl (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilovice

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 32
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast