Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco-Paolo Mastropasqua

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1786Born
22 Dec 181024.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 183750.9SelectedBishop of Nusco, Italy
2 Oct 183751.0ConfirmedBishop of Nusco, Italy
15 Oct 183751.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
26 Jun 184861.7DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco-Paolo Mastropasqua (VIAF: 89260313)
Bishop Francesco-Paolo Mastropasqua (born , died ) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolfetta

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,212
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast