Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Marone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1791³Born
23 Dec 181524.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 183746.0SelectedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
15 Feb 183846.1ConfirmedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
25 Feb 184149.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
18 Jun 185361.5ResignedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
1860¹68.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccola Marone
Bishop Niccola Marone (born , died 1860) Bishop Emeritus of Ruvo e Bitonto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAccettura

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast