Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Farace

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1785BornRoseto
30 Jun 183752.0SelectedBishop of Bovino, Italy
2 Oct 183752.2ConfirmedBishop of Bovino, Italy
15 Oct 183752.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
10 May 185165.8DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Farace:
Bishop Francesco Saverio Farace (born , died ) Bishop of Bovino

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,211
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013