Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Poell, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Cybistra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1845Born
1861¹15.7ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1869¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
20 Jun 189045.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}, China
20 Jun 189045.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cybistra
14 Sep 189045.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cybistra
2 Jan 189145.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Poell (VIAF: 280761900)
Bishop Martin Poell O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeert, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017