Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri de La Mothe-Houdancourt

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603¹BornBeauvais
31 Jul 163936.6SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
17 Dec 164038.0ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
5 Jan 164239.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
166057.0ResignedBishop of Rennes, France
166158.0SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
24 Mar 166461.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
24 Feb 168481.1DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri de La Mothe-Houdancourt:
Archbishop Henri de La Mothe-Houdancourt (died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a bishop for 42.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 105, and Page 293

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 10 Nov 2014