Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Sanguettola

Deceased

Bishop of Crema


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1788BornMilan
23 May 181224.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 183547.0AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
21 Jun 183547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
10 Feb 185465.9DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Sanguettola:
Bishop Giuseppe Sanguettola (born , died ) Bishop of Crema

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013